WA HB1796 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recreation access on state lands.
Title
Concerning recreation access on state lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-04-15 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-04-15 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-04-15 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-04-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-02-02 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |