WA HB1796 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing drug-related overdose prevention and treatment.
Title
Addressing drug-related overdose prevention and treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-17 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-29 | PSEP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-12 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-18 | PSEP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |