WA HB1794 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning agreements between licensed marijuana businesses and other people and businesses, including royalty and licensing agreements relating to the use of intellectual property.
Title
Concerning agreements between licensed marijuana businesses and other people and businesses, including royalty and licensing agreements relating to the use of intellectual property.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | House | Chapter 380, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |