WA HB1792 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying timelines and other initial procedural actions in a water rights adjudication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying timelines and other initial procedural actions in a water rights adjudication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20HouseEffective date 7/23/2023.
2023-04-20HouseChapter 160, 2023 Laws.
2023-04-20HouseGovernor signed.
2023-04-14HouseDelivered to Governor.
2023-04-08SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2023-04-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-30SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-03-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-03-23SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2023-03-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2023-03-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2023-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2023-02-28HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-02-28HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-02-22HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-17HouseAGNR - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM.
2023-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM.
2023-02-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2023-02-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9003120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9003130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9003140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9003625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9003635Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9003645Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1792&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1792.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1792.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1792.SL.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1792%20HBA%20AGNR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1792%20HBR%20AGNR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1792%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1792%20SBA%20AWNP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1792%20SBR%20AWNP%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1792%20SBR%20AWNP%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1792%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1792%20HBR%20PL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1792%20HBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66888
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67075
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=129007&actionText=AGNR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30728&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=129007&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1792&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=129007&actionText=AWNP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31036&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=129007&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-06-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1792&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback