WA HB1792 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to House Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to House Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the production, distribution, and use of hydrogen not produced from a fossil fuel feedstock.
Title
Expanding the production, distribution, and use of hydrogen not produced from a fossil fuel feedstock.
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Peter Abbarno [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Returned to House Rules. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-17 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2022-01-21 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 92 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 04 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 29a | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |