WA HB1791 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Studying the need for increased commercial aviation services.
Title
Studying the need for increased commercial aviation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-15 | House | Chapter 463, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-15 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2023-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-23 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | New Code | See Bill Text |