WA HB1791 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reprimands for professional educators.
Title
Concerning reprimands for professional educators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |