WA HB1791 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 8/1/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 8/1/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying certain community custody and drug offender sentencing alternative sentencing provisions.
Title
Clarifying certain community custody and drug offender sentencing alternative sentencing provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Rep. Mary Dickerson [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Christopher Hurst [D] |
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Effective date 8/1/2009*. | |
2009-05-07 | Chapter 389, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-07 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-14 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-14 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-03 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-16 | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5702 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.