WA HB1790 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dependency petitions where the department of social and health services is the petitioner.
Title
Concerning dependency petitions where the department of social and health services is the petitioner.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-09 | House | Chapter 17, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |