WA HB1789 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making adjustments to the service and filing fees for vehicle subagents and county auditors.
Title
Making adjustments to the service and filing fees for vehicle subagents and county auditors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 417, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2019-04-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |