WA HB1786 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making supplemental transportation appropriations for the 2021-2023 fiscal biennium.
Title
Making supplemental transportation appropriations for the 2021-2023 fiscal biennium.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5689 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2022.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 68 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 68 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |