WA HB1786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving procedures and strengthening laws relating to protection orders, no-contact orders, and restraining orders.
Title
Improving procedures and strengthening laws relating to protection orders, no-contact orders, and restraining orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 245, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 54; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |