WA HB1782 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating additional middle housing near transit and in areas traditionally dedicated to single-family detached housing.
Title
Creating additional middle housing near transit and in areas traditionally dedicated to single-family detached housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Local Government (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Local Government. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5670 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21c | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |