WA HB1779 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning esthetics.
Title
Concerning esthetics.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-08 | House | Chapter 187, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-27 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2013-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |