WA HB1777 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain existing ambulatory surgical facilities from certificate of need.
Title
Exempting certain existing ambulatory surgical facilities from certificate of need.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | House | Chapter 31, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |