WA HB1776 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Making changes to support future operations of the state all payer claims database by transferring the responsibility to the health care authority, partnering with a lead organization with broad data experience, including with self-insured employers, and other changes to improve and ensure successful and sustainable database operations for access to and use of the data to improve health care, providing consumers useful and consistent quality and cost measures, and assess total cost of care in Washington state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making changes to support future operations of the state all payer claims database by transferring the responsibility to the health care authority, partnering with a lead organization with broad data experience, including with self-insured employers, and other changes to improve and ensure successful and sustainable database operations for access to and use of the data to improve health care, providing consumers useful and consistent quality and cost measures, and assess total cost of care in Washington state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12House2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-15HouseITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB5741 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 5/8/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback