WA HB1772 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the personal needs allowance for persons receiving state-financed care.
Title
Increasing the personal needs allowance for persons receiving state-financed care.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB5118 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2017*.