WA HB1770 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening energy codes.
Title
Strengthening energy codes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5669 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 27a | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 27a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 27a | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |