WA HB1769 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning community municipal corporations.
Title
Concerning community municipal corporations.
Sponsors
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 26, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 10 | 540 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 14 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 14 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 14 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 14 | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 14 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 14 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35a | 14 | 025 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |