WA HB1769 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a vessel crewmember license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning a vessel crewmember license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-02SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2019-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-22HouseRDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback