WA HB1769 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reinstating tax preferences for high-technology research and development.
Title
Reinstating tax preferences for high-technology research and development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2015-03-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-04 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB5665 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1769&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1769.pdf |