WA HB1767 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of publicly owned electric utilities to engage in targeted electrification through the adoption of plans that establish a finding that utility outreach and investment in the conversion of its customers' end use equipment from fossil fuels to electricity will provide net benefits to the utility.
Title
Concerning the authority of publicly owned electric utilities to engage in targeted electrification through the adoption of plans that establish a finding that utility outreach and investment in the conversion of its customers' end use equipment from fossil fuels to electricity will provide net benefits to the utility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5666 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-19 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 92 | 430 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
54 | 16 | 390 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |