WA HB1765 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning special occasion liquor licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning special occasion liquor licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-16HouseRSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6624010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6624380Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1765&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1765.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1765-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1765%20HBA%20RSG%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1765%20HBR%20RSG%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67087
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67212
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68083
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128921&actionText=RSG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30782&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback