WA HB1764 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting monetary thresholds for found property.
Title
Adjusting monetary thresholds for found property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | House | Chapter 30, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |