WA HB1760 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding access to dual credit programs.
Title
Expanding access to dual credit programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-28 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION, OFFICE (OSPI)
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION, OFFICE (OSPI)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 320 | 196 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 600 | 287 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 290 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 630 | 600 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 76 | 730 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |