WA HB1760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning off-site mitigation for projects permitted under chapter 77.55 RCW.
Title
Concerning off-site mitigation for projects permitted under chapter 77.55 RCW.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |