WA HB1760 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing students with skills that promote mental health and well-being and increase academic performance.
Title
Providing students with skills that promote mental health and well-being and increase academic performance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5688 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.