WA HB1757 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a sales and use tax remittance to qualified farmers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a sales and use tax remittance to qualified farmers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25HouseEffective date 7/1/2024.
2024-03-25HouseChapter 222, 2024 Laws.
2024-03-25HouseGovernor signed.
2024-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2024-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2024-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2024-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2024-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2024-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2024-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2024-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2024-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2024-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2024-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2024-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2024-01-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2024-01-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-01-11HouseFloor amendment
2024-01-11HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2024-01-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2023-04-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2023-04-20HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2023-04-20HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-04-20HouseFloor amendment
2023-04-19HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-03-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-03-09HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2023-03-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8208New CodeSee Bill Text
8212New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1757&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1757.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1757.E.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1757.E2.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1757.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1757.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1757%20AMH%20CORR%20TAYT%20312.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1757%20AMH%20CORR%20TAYT%20313.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1757.E%20AMH%20CORR%20H2553.2.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1757%20HBA%20FIN%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1757%20HBR%20FIN%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1757.E%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67176
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67979
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68705
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1757.E2%20HBR%20APH%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70011
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1757.E2%20SBA%20WM%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1757.E2%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1757.E2%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1757.E2%20HBR%20PL%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1757.E2%20SBR%20APS%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=71401
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1757.E2%20HBR%20FBR%2024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128889&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30921&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128889&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-20-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1757&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128889&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-11-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1757&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128889&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=32066&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128889&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1757&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback