WA HB1756 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a military improvement zone program.
Title
Creating a military improvement zone program.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Finance. | |
2009-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-16 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-28 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1756&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1756.pdf |