WA HB1755 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing regional universities to offer doctorate level degrees in education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing regional universities to offer doctorate level degrees in education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2019-02-18HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-15HouseCWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback