WA HB1753 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a statement of inquiry for rules affecting fees related to health professions.
Title
Requiring a statement of inquiry for rules affecting fees related to health professions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Chapter 303, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |