WA HB1752 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a Roth option to deferred compensation plans.
Title
Adding a Roth option to deferred compensation plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Chapter 72, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |