WA HB1751 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing fire protection district annexations and mergers within a reasonable geographic proximity and eliminating cross-county restrictions for annexations to a fire protection district.
Title
Allowing fire protection district annexations and mergers within a reasonable geographic proximity and eliminating cross-county restrictions for annexations to a fire protection district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Local Government. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-02-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5454 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.