WA HB1747 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning risk-based water quality standards for on-site nonpotable water systems.
Title
Concerning risk-based water quality standards for on-site nonpotable water systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |