WA HB1744 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collaborative arrangements between institutions of higher education and nonprofit private entities that provide comprehensive cancer care.
Title
Concerning collaborative arrangements between institutions of higher education and nonprofit private entities that provide comprehensive cancer care.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Chapter 71, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 26 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 06 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 40 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 56 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 80 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 30 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 52 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 56 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 09 | 290 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |