WA HB1743 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the disposition of the remains of a county resident who dies indigent in an adjacent county outside of Washington.
Title
Concerning the disposition of the remains of a county resident who dies indigent in an adjacent county outside of Washington.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |