WA HB1741 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing affordability through health care provider contracting.
Title
Addressing affordability through health care provider contracting.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Frank Chopp [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 43 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |