WA HB1739 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning firearms that are undetectable or untraceable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning firearms that are undetectable or untraceable.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseEffective date 7/1/2019.
2019-05-07HouseChapter 243, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23HousePassed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04HouseVote on third reading will be reconsidered.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-15HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-08HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-01HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-29HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1739&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1739.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1739-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1739-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1739-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118788&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1739&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118788&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1739&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118788&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1739&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback