WA HB1737 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning utility service annexation covenants.
Title
Concerning utility service annexation covenants.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] |
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1737&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1737.pdf |