WA HB1730 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting an excise tax on capital gains to improve the fairness of Washington's tax system and provide funding for the education legacy trust account.
Title
Enacting an excise tax on capital gains to improve the fairness of Washington's tax system and provide funding for the education legacy trust account.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5111 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-21 - Failed final passage; yeas, 0; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 1.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1730&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1730.pdf |