WA HB1728 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a statewide resiliency program.
Title
Creating a statewide resiliency program.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Donaghy [D] | Rep. Alicia Rule [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-20 | House | Chapter 157, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2023-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-04 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-15 | House | ICEV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |