WA HB1727 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending in-person voter registration.
Title
Extending in-person voter registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1727&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1727.pdf |