WA HB1725 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exemption from background check requirements for firearms sales or transfers between concealed pistol license holders.
Title
Establishing an exemption from background check requirements for firearms sales or transfers between concealed pistol license holders.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] |
Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1725&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1725.pdf |