WA HB1723 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Closing the digital equity divide by increasing the accessibility and affordability of telecommunications services, devices, and training.
Title
Closing the digital equity divide by increasing the accessibility and affordability of telecommunications services, devices, and training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022*. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 265, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | ENET - Majority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-19 | House | CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
2021-12-30 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
COMPUTERS
EQUITY, WASHINGTON STATE OFFICE
GOVERNOR
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
MINORITIES
NAMED ACTS
TELECOMMUNICATIONS
EQUITY, WASHINGTON STATE OFFICE
GOVERNOR
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
MINORITIES
NAMED ACTS
TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 330 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 330 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 530 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |