WA HB1722 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning local options for tabulating votes in an election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning local options for tabulating votes in an election.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB5708 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-29 - First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback