WA HB1722 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing plan membership default provisions in the public employees' retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing plan membership default provisions in the public employees' retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-01-11 Referred to Ways & Means.
2010-01-11 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2010-01-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2009-04-26 By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2009-03-13 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2009-03-11 Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2009-03-11 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-03-10 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2009-02-20 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-02-18 Minority; do not pass.
2009-02-18 WAYS - Majority; do pass.
2009-02-18 WAYS - Executive action taken by committee.
2009-02-18 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2009-02-09 Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2009-01-28 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

SB5307 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback