WA HB1717 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning state agency collection, use, and retention of biometric identifiers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning state agency collection, use, and retention of biometric identifiers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-05-16HouseChapter 306, 2017 Laws.
2017-05-16HouseGovernor signed.
2017-04-18HouseDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-17SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-04-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-03-29SenateSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.
2017-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-02House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-14HouseTED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback