WA HB1716 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the construction registration inspection account as a dedicated account to fund contractor registration and compliance, manufactured and mobile homes, recreational and commercial vehicles, factory built housing and commercial structures, elevators, lifting devices, and moving walks.
Title
Creating the construction registration inspection account as a dedicated account to fund contractor registration and compliance, manufactured and mobile homes, recreational and commercial vehicles, factory built housing and commercial structures, elevators, lifting devices, and moving walks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Effective date 7/1/2017. |
2017-07-06 | House | Chapter 11, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Held on third reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-13 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |