WA HB1715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removing school districts' ability to withhold pupils' grades and transcripts.
Title
Removing school districts' ability to withhold pupils' grades and transcripts.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Entenman [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5669 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.