WA HB1713 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring cost sharing for prescription drugs to be counted against an enrollee's obligation, regardless of source.
Title
Requiring cost sharing for prescription drugs to be counted against an enrollee's obligation, regardless of source.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5610 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 05 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1713&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1713.pdf |